KSEEB Solutions for Class 6 Maths Chapter 2 Whole Numbers Ex 2.3

   

Students can Download Chapter 2 Whole Numbers Ex 2.3 Questions and Answers, Notes Pdf, KSEEB Solutions for Class 6 Maths helps you to revise the complete Karnataka State Board Syllabus and score more marks in your examinations.

Karnataka State Syllabus Class 6 Maths Chapter 2 Whole Numbers Ex 2.3

Question 1.
Which of the following will not represent zero:
a) 1 + 0
b) 0 × 0
c) \(\frac{0}{2}\)
d) \(\frac{10-10}{2}\)
a) 1 + 0 = 1 It does not represent zero
b) 0 × 0 = 0 It represent zero
c) \(\frac{0}{2}=0\) It represents zero
d) \(\frac{10-10}{2}=\frac{0}{2}=0\) It represent zero
Solution:
a) 1 + 0 = 1

Question 2.
If the product of two whole numbers is zero, can we say that one or both of them will be zero ? Justify through examples.
Solution:
If the product of 2 whole numbers is zero, then one of them is definitely zero,
For example, 0 × 2 =0 and 17 × 0 = 0
It the product of 2 whole numbers is zero them both of them may be zero 0 × 0 = 0
However, 2 × 3 = 6
(Since number to be multiplied are not equal to zero, the result of the product will also be non-zero.

KSEEB Solutions for Class 6 Maths Chapter 2 Whole Numbers Ex 2.3

Question 3.
If the product of two whole numbers is 1, can we say that one or both of them will be 1? Justify through examples?
Solution:
If the product of 2 numbers is, then both the numbers have to be equal to 1
For example ,1 × 1 = 1 However, 1 × 6 = 6
Clearly, the product of two whole numbers will be 1 in the situation when both numbers to be multiplied are 1.

Question 4.
Find using distributive property:
a) 728 × 101
b) 5437 × 1001
c) 824 × 25
d) 4275 × 125
e) 504 × 35
Solution:
a) 728 × 101 = 728 × (100+1)
= 728 × 100 + 728 + 1
= 72800 + 728 = 73528

b) 5437 × 1001 = 5437 × (1000 + 1)
= 5437 × 1000 + 5437 × 1
= 5437000 + 5437 = 5442437

c) 824 × 25 = (800 + 024) × 25
= (800 + 25 – 1) × 25
= 800 × 25 + 25 × 25 – 1 × 25 = 20000 + 625 – 25
= 20000 + 600 = 20600

KSEEB Solutions for Class 6 Maths Chapter 2 Whole Numbers Ex 2.3

d) 4275 × 125
= (4000 + 200 + 100 – 25 ) × 125 = 4000 × 125 + 200 × 125 + 100 + 125 – 25 × 125
= 500000 + 25000 + 12500 – 3125
= 534375

e) 504 × 35 = ( 500 + 4) × 35
= 500 × 35 + 4 × 35
= 17500 + 140 = 17640

KSEEB Solutions for Class 6 Maths Chapter 2 Whole Numbers Ex 2.3

Question 5.
Study the pattern :
1 × 8 + 1 = 9
12 × 8 + 2 = 98
123 × 8 + 3 = 987
1234 × 8 + 4 = 9876
12345 × 8 + 5 = 98765
Write the next two steps, can you say how the pattern works?
(Hint: 12345 = 11111 + 1111 +111 +11 +1).
Solution
123456 × 8 + 6 = 987648 + 6 = 987654
1234567 × 8 + 7 = 9876536 + 7 = 9876543
Yes, the pattern works.
As 123456= 111111 + 11111 + 1111 + 111 + 11 + 1.
123456 × 8 = ( 111111 + 11111 + 1111 + 111 + 11 + 1) × 8
= 111111 × 8 + 11111 × 8 + 1111 × 8 + 111 × 8 + 11 × 8 + 1 × 8
= 888888 + 88888 + 8888 +888 + 88 + 8 = 987648
= 123456 × 8 + 6 = 987648 + 6 = 987654

error: Content is protected !!